|
Post-WW2 Military and Naval Aviation Please use this forum to discuss Military and Naval Aviation after the Second World War. |
|
Thread Tools | Display Modes |
#1
|
|||
|
|||
Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Looking for confirmation of a name connected with a Spitfire accident at Martlesham Heath in October 1959.
The Name I have is 'Group Captain W.A.The**'. The Air Force list for 1941 has a 'Wing Commander W.A.Theed', an armament officer of 202 Group, Cairo. Many thanks PeterA |
#2
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Where Spitfires still in service in 1959? If so, what unit?
I thought they were retired in 1954??? Regards, |
#3
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Appointments Royal Air Force November 1959
Bomber Command Group Captain W.A.Theed to HQ and Command Armanents Officer, Nov 16 BTW this is Walter Alan THEED #34075 He was previously at HQ 11 Group for Technical Staff Duties But a few more details would help date/serial would confirm???? |
#4
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Thanks Paul, just what I was looking for.
Revi 16 -TE476 Mk XVI Battle of Britain Flight. PeterA |
#5
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Peter
Great BTW which one had a Wheels Up on Feb 1958 ? TE330 TE476 or SL574 BTW surely nor BBMF then but No.11 Group Communications Flight ? Paul |
#6
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Quote:
SL574 had two accidents, TE476 had the one and TE330 none at all...according to the movement cards...however etc. February 1958 does not fit with any of the above. May I ask where this comes from? I was careful not to say BBMF...just BBF, the unofficial title at that time, with May 1958 being the formal transfer to 11 GCF. Peter |
#7
|
|||
|
|||
Re: Air Force List for circa 1959, looking for ...
Peter source was article in The Times August 1959 I will send you copy tomorrow
|
|
|
Similar Threads | ||||
Thread | Thread Starter | Forum | Replies | Last Post |
RAF and RAAF ORBs available on the Web | Laurent Rizzotti | Allied and Soviet Air Forces | 43 | 23rd October 2015 14:46 |
RAF Bomber Command 'Y' Reports | Bruce Dennis | Allied and Soviet Air Forces | 8 | 29th December 2011 21:58 |
National Archives Kew | David P. Williams | Allied and Soviet Air Forces | 17 | 4th June 2010 01:44 |
Airpower summary | Pilot | Post-WW2 Military and Naval Aviation | 0 | 23rd February 2007 15:11 |
VVS divisions | Mike35nj | Allied and Soviet Air Forces | 2 | 7th August 2006 13:27 |